Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Miller, Gail E, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Greason, James Harrell, against Gulfstream International Airlines Inc, represented by Thornton, J Thompson, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2012 |
CategoryNeg - Negligence Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 24, 2013Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: May 13, 2014Response to Request for Production
Date: December 20, 2013Request for Production
Date: September 23, 2013Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 23, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ACCEPTANCE OF PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENTParty: Defendant Gulfstream International Airlines Inc |
|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement Party: Plaintiff Miller, Gail E |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIESParty: Defendant Gulfstream International Airlines Inc |
|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs Party: Plaintiff Miller, Gail E |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Miller, Gail E |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Discovery Party: Defendant Gulfstream International Airlines Inc |
|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION / plaintiff |
|
September 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses Party: Defendant Gulfstream International Airlines Inc |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Production (FIRST) TO PLAINTIFFParty: Defendant Gulfstream International Airlines Inc |
|
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs (FIRST) SET OF) TO PLAINTIFFParty: Defendant Gulfstream International Airlines Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.