Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Suntrust Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Forsyth, Douglas W., Esq., against Doku, John, Doku, Tonisha S, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Singer, Michele Towbin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2012 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Order
Date: April 18, 2013Notice of Mediation
Date: May 06, 2013Consent
Date: May 31, 2013Petition
Date: December 18, 2013Order to Show Cause
Date: February 10, 2014Order
Date: March 14, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Plaintiff's Order to Show Cause dated February 5, 2014 is hereby DISSOLVED |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Rule to Show Cause Returned Served 17th day of February, 2014 (VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE)Party: Defendant Doku, Tonisha S |
|
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AGAINST DEFENDANT TONISHA S. DOKUParty: Plaintiff Suntrust Bank | |
October 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition in Aid of Execution OF Tonisha S. Doku |
|
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Directions to the Clerk | |
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Consent FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENTParty: Defendant Doku, Tonisha S |
|
May 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediation May 31, 2013 at 2:00 PM |
|
April 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION/C Robert Murray Jr |
|
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 4/18/13 8:45am rm 930b |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.