Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Naderpour, Amir, against Johnson, Demeko V, Johnson, Vince L, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2012 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Notice
Date: May 02, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Directions to the Clerk CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice 60 DAY NOTICE OF COURT'S INTENT TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FLA. R. CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.420(e); 7/19/13 @ 2m rm 940 |
|
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default & Default against dfsParty: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit of dfsParty: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA |
|
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 02/13/2012Party: Defendant Johnson, Demeko V |
|
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 02/13/2012Party: Defendant Johnson, Vince L |
|
February 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: NADERPOUR, AMIR ; Userid: CTS-lwhite ; Receipt: 20122YA2C000221; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
February 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
February 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: NADERPOUR, AMIR ; Userid: CTS-lwhite ; Receipt: 20122YA2C000221; ;Amount: $20.00 |
|
February 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Party: Defendant Johnson, Vince L Defendant Johnson, Demeko V |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.