Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Nationstar Mtg Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Solloa, H. M., Esq., against Zapata, Lourdes, Flores, Kelek, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2012 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter Returned From Post Office | |
August 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
August 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
August 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale | |
July 31, 2012 | Hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
July 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Sale Fee Payor: Elizabeth Wellborn ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20121RA1A013079; ;Amount: $70.00 |
|
July 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Assignment of Bid FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication ELIZABETH WELLBORN |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale Party: Attorney Solloa, H. M., ESQ. |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Copies Mailed to all Parties; FJ/NSDB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.