Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Express Centurion, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Szilvasy, Brian K, against Sayih, Robert, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form - Disposed By Judge
Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Comment: (CERTIFICATION OF PL'S ATTY)Party: Plaintiff American Express Centurion Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 12/01/09 at 08:30 rm 1010a Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Attorney's Time Aff Of Atty'S Time Spent/brian K Szilvasy (9de) Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney Fees Aff For Reasonable Atty Fees/robert John Dykes (9de) Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Not Of Filing Additional Docs/attached/pl (9de) Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion For Summary Final Judgment And Attorneys Fees/pltf (Jxn)
Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Ans & Affirmative Defenses /deft Robert Sayih (Tds) Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served Sums Retd Srvd 01-06-09 Robert Sayih (Tds) Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet (1ap)
Judge: 04 Perlman, Sandra |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.