Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Riddell, Rosann, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Miron, Joshua D., against Fernandez, Emma, Fortson, Daniel A, Jr., represented by Miron, Joshua D., Carbonell, Alberto M, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Thomas Lynch presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2007 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss for lack of prosecution/third partyParty: Plaintiff Riddell, Rosann Defendant Fernandez, Emma |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss for lack of prosecution/third partyParty: Defendant Fernandez, Emma Plaintiff Riddell, Rosann Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 02/22/12 8:45 rm 1005-b Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
October 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order upon glantz & glantz pa's motion to withdraw/granted Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order upon deft counter pltf fortson's motion to compel return of monies secured per vacated settlement ageement/denied without prejudice Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Re-Notice of Hearing 10/15/09 at 08:45 am Rm 0840 Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
August 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation of hrg 09/01/09 at 8:45am Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
August 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw (corrected)/Atty for defts Daniel Fortson & Gail Marshall Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
August 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 09/01/09 @ 8:45 am Rm 840 Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Availability/deft (Lxl)
Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.