Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hornbacher, Richard, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Pro Se, against Knowles, Brenda, Hornbacher, Brenda, Store Room Third Avenue Llc, represented by Pro Se, Carpenter, James Whitcomb J, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Order On Deft'S Second Mot For Contempt: Fld/rec And For Sanctions Is Granted. Pleadings Of Pltf AreStruck & The Case Is Dismissed. (9jo) | |
September 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Re-Notice of Hearing 8:45 Re-Notice Of Hrg 8:45am 10/1/08 Rm 840 Motion Calendar Changes 9/22/08 Date (Lxl) |
|
September 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion for Contempt 2nd Motion For Contempt And Sanctions/deft The Store Room 3rd Ave Llc (Lmg) |
|
September 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Re-Notice of Hearing 8:45 Re-Notice Of Hrg 8:45am 9/22/08 8:45am Motion Calendar Changes 9/3/08 Date (Lxl) |
|
September 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 10/06/08 At 08:45 Rm 0840-Notice Of Hearing (Sap) |
|
September 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Order On Motion To Withdraw/granted/all Pleadins Mailed To Pltf (Lxl) | |
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion To Withdraw /marie A Lurie Atty For Pltf (Jdd) | |
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 09/03/08 At 08:45 Rm 840-Notice Of Hearing (Lxl) |
|
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 09/03/08 At 08:45 Rm 840-Notice Of Hearing Motion Calendar (Lxl) |
|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion for Contempt 2nd Mot For Contempt And Sanctions/df The Store Room Third Ave Llc (Thg) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.