Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Synergy Chiropractic & Wellness Ctr Inc, filed a(n) * Pip Claims > $5,000 - $15,000 case represented by Avrunin, Nathan J, against Allstate Property & Cas Ins Co, represented by Brehm, Douglas G, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Lee, Robert W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLee, Robert W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 02, 2012 |
Category* Pip Claims > $5,000 - $15,000 |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Motion
Date: March 06, 2014Order Referring Case to Mediation
Date: April 30, 2014Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: January 09, 2014Request for Admissions
Date: March 06, 2014Notice of Lack of Prosecution
Date: December 20, 2013Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 06, 2014Notice of Filing Arbitrator Decision W/Sealed Decision
Date: August 28, 2014Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 26, 2014Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 02, 2014Response
Date: June 02, 2014Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 02, 2014Hearing Proceedings
Date: October 13, 2014Motion
Date: June 02, 2014Notice of Mediation
Date: May 15, 2014Order Referring Case to Arbitration
Date: June 16, 2014Motion for New Trial
Date: August 28, 2014Appendix
Date: October 17, 2014Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: October 17, 2014Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: January 22, 2015Supplemental Request for Admissions
Date: February 07, 2015Notice of Appeal
Date: February 13, 2015Receipt for Appeals
Date: March 12, 2015Mediation Report
Date: June 18, 2014Response
Date: June 02, 2014Order Granting
Date: October 14, 2014Order Setting
Date: June 16, 2014Notice of Appearance
Date: February 13, 2015Request for Production
Date: March 06, 2014Notice of Filing
Date: August 05, 2014Order Setting
Date: September 09, 2014Response
Date: June 02, 2014Motion to Stay
Date: October 10, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Receipt for Appeals Case No: 15 002820 |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certified & True Copy Issued ****DFs Notice of Appeal as to 01/20/2015 Final Judgment to Circuit Civil**** |
|
February 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: SUZANNE LABRIT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A021354; ;Amount: $281.00 |
|
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AppellateParty: Defendant Allstate Property & Cas Ins Co |
|
February 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Synergy Chiropractic & Wellness Ctr Inc |
|
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees Party: Plaintiff Synergy Chiropractic & Wellness Ctr Inc |
|
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Appendix IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS AND BRIEF |
|
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAWParty: Defendant Allstate Property & Cas Ins Co |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Granting DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.