Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Chapel Trial Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Kaplan, Russell Dean, against Adams, Eric, South Beach Concessions Incorporated, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Miranda, Giuseppina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMiranda, Giuseppina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 26, 2012 |
Category* Cc Damages >$5,000 - $15,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Order
Date: January 23, 2014Agreed Order
Date: December 18, 2013Ex Parte Order
Date: October 15, 2013Affidavit in Support of Motion
Date: January 22, 2014Motion
Date: January 06, 2014Motion for Order
Date: October 15, 2013Order
Date: May 14, 2013Motion for Final Judgment
Date: September 18, 2013Motion for Contempt
Date: January 13, 2014Subpoena Duces Tecum in Aid of Execution Retd Served
Date: June 18, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy Party: Defendant Adams, Eric |
|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Vacation NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITYParty: Plaintiff Chapel Trial Associates LLC |
|
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event | eWrit Issuance - Execution | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation OF HEARING / January 30,2014 at 10:00am |
|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certified Copy Fee Payor: RUSSELL D KAPLAN ; Userid: CTS-jarqueta ; Receipt: 20141YF1B000187; omments: FINAL JGMT ;Amount: $12.00 |
|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Copy/Misc Fee Payor: RUSSELL D KAPLAN ; Userid: CTS-jarqueta ; Receipt: 20141YF1B000187; omments: FINAL JGMT ;Amount: $8.00 |
|
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order on PL Motion for Contempt |
|
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney Fees as to Second Supplemental Final Judgment |
|
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support of Motion MOTION FOR CONTEMPT |
|
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Attorney Fees & Costs as to Second Supplemental Final Judgmrnt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.