Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
St Hilaire, Lucrecia, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Breier, Mordechai L, Esq., against Citizens Property Ins Corp, represented by Ward, Philip E., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Lee, Robert W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLee, Robert W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 25, 2012 |
Category* Cc Damages >$5,000 - $15,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
See Comment
Date: July 31, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
See Comment Joint Stipulation of Dismissal w/prej |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Unavailability 3-22-13 through 3-29-13 reced 3-5-13Party: Attorney Breier, Mordechai L, ESQ. |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories verifiedParty: Defendant Citizens Property Ins Corp |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Citizens Property Ins Corp |
|
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Party: Defendant Citizens Property Ins Corp |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Taking Deposition Lucrecia St Hilaire |
|
December 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses /Defendant recd on 12/10/12 |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request to Produce (First) to PlParty: Defendant Citizens Property Ins Corp |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs (First Set) to PlParty: Defendant Citizens Property Ins Corp |
|
November 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.