Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Tian, Enpeng, represented by Yang , Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2018 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Traffic School Completion - Submitted | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Traffic School Requested - Fees Attached | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Letter Sent | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Traffic School due date | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Trial De Novo
Judge: Hardcastle, Virgil Wayne |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Letter Sent | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Order and Notice to Defendant of New Trial (Trial de Novo) | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for New Trial (Trial De Novo | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Decision and Notice of Decision |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.