Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sanon, Edena, Sanon, Jean Ronald, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Regueyra, Alberto M, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Berrios-Ayala, Mark Kenneth, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLevenson, Jeffrey R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Jean Ronald Sanon and Edena Sanon against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege that they had a homeowners insurance policy with the defendant, and the policy was in effect when their proper...
Witness List
Date: June 14, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 14, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 28, 2022Witness List
Date: June 22, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 27, 2022Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: July 18, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: June 16, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 18, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: July 28, 2022Expert Interrogatories
Date: August 29, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: August 25, 2022Witness List
Date: August 29, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 29, 2022Request for Production
Date: August 29, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 15, 2022Subpoena Returned Served
Date: August 19, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 30, 2022Motion in Limine
Date: August 31, 2022Order Extending Time
Date: August 30, 2022Request for Production
Date: August 31, 2022Motion in Limine
Date: August 31, 2022Motion in Limine
Date: August 31, 2022Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: August 31, 2022Motion in Limine
Date: September 19, 2022Motion in Limine
Date: September 19, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: September 06, 2022Amended Witness List
Date: September 06, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: September 15, 2022Expert Witness List
Date: September 27, 2022Motion in Limine
Date: August 31, 2022Mediation Report
Date: October 03, 2022Notice of Mediation
Date: September 21, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: October 07, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 24, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: August 24, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: August 25, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: August 25, 2021Notice of Interrogatories
Date: August 25, 2021Request for Production
Date: August 25, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 29, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 28, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 01, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: October 05, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: November 01, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: November 10, 2021Motion for Sanctions
Date: November 24, 2021Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 27, 2022Notice of Supplemental Authority
Date: January 14, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: February 04, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: January 19, 2022Motion
Date: March 23, 2022Order Granting Motion
Date: April 08, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: April 07, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 23, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: February 02, 2022Notice of Limited Appearance
Date: January 19, 2022Response to Motion
Date: January 19, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: November 24, 2021Answer to Complaint
Date: February 01, 2022Cross Notice
Date: December 23, 2021Memorandum in Support
Date: January 19, 2022Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: April 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Expert Witness List | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine #1 REGARDING REFERENCE TO CERTAIN MATTERSParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine #2 REGARDING REFERENCE TO OR USE OF REPORTS THAT CONTAIN IRRELEVANT EVIDENCE, INADMISSIBLE HEARSAY AND HAVE NOT BEEN AUTHENTICATEDParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Witness List | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine REGARDING ANY DOCUMENTS, INFORMATION, PHOTOGRAPHS, AUDIO, OR VIDEO THAT DEFENDANT DID NOT PRODUCE INDISCOVERYParty: Plaintiff Sanon, Jean Ronald Plaintiff Sanon, Edena |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.