Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Liberis, Simson, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Moreau, Lucas T, against Brown, Curtis, Geico General Insurance Company, represented by Brust, Steven E, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaimes, David A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
eSummons Issuance
Date: August 23, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Video Deposition
Date: August 23, 2021Request to Produce
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: August 23, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 23, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: August 31, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: August 24, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: September 22, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 20, 2021Request for Production
Date: September 21, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: September 21, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 14, 2021Agreed Order
Date: November 09, 2021Response to Request to Produce
Date: November 15, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 17, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 15, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 15, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: December 15, 2021Order Granting Motion
Date: December 22, 2021Case Management Order
Date: January 03, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 25, 2022Answer to Complaint
Date: January 11, 2022Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 18, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: June 30, 2022Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: March 01, 2022Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: March 03, 2022Notice of Non Objection to Production
Date: March 02, 2022Expert Witness List
Date: November 28, 2022Witness List
Date: October 27, 2022Motion to Bifurcate
Date: April 26, 2022Request for Production
Date: December 21, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: December 21, 2022Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 07, 2023Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 09, 2023Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: March 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference on 02-16-2023 9:15 AM |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference https://17thllcourts.zoom.us/j/111475745 of the Broward County Courthouse, 201 SE 6th Street, Ft Lauerdale, FL 33301 on 02-13-2023 9:15 AM |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Interrogs | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Expert Witness List | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Bifurcate Party: Defendant Geico General Insurance Company |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351) Party: Plaintiff Liberis, Simson |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Non Objection to Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.