Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Garcia, Belkis, Pimentel, Luis, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Pimentel, Luis, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Diaz, Julissa, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiffs Luis Pimentel and Belkis Garcia against Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company for breach of contract. The Plaintiffs seek damages in excess of $30,000, exclusive of interest, attorneys' fees, ...
Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: June 18, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: July 21, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 13, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: June 18, 2021Notice of Video Deposition
Date: June 18, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: June 18, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 18, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: June 18, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: June 25, 2021Request for Production
Date: June 18, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: June 18, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 15, 2021Request for Production
Date: July 21, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: June 21, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 10, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: July 07, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 06, 2021Interrogatories
Date: July 21, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: August 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Pimentel, Luis Plaintiff Garcia, Belkis |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY REQUESTSParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Interrogatories | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.