Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shields, Raquel, Shields, Thomas Bryan, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Norton, Donald Thomas, against Gitta, Brigitta, Smith, Rachele L., Usaa Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaimes, David A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: June 17, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: July 13, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: June 17, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: June 18, 2021Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem
Date: July 16, 2021Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Administrator
Date: July 17, 2021Report of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: August 02, 2021Motion
Date: August 03, 2021Order Discharging Guardian Ad Litem
Date: August 19, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: August 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Discharging Guardian Ad Litem | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion TO APPROVE MINOR'S SETTLEMENTParty: Plaintiff Shields, Thomas Bryan Plaintiff Shields, Raquel |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Report of Guardian Ad Litem | |
July 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Administrator William G. Wolk, Esq |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem Party: Plaintiff Shields, Thomas Bryan Plaintiff Shields, Raquel |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Party: Plaintiff Shields, Thomas Bryan Plaintiff Shields, Raquel |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO NONE |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) For Damages and Demand For Jury TrialParty: Plaintiff Shields, Thomas Bryan |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet Amount: $100,001.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.