Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Vicente, Elizabeth, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Ridge, Peter Joseph, against Ebanks, Larose, Enterprise Leasing Company Of Florida, Llc, represented by Fernandez, George L, Owens, Karissa Louise, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Robinson, Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobinson, Michael A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 06, 2022Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 16, 2022Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: June 06, 2022Request for Copies
Date: June 10, 2022Mediation Report
Date: June 21, 2022Certificate
Date: June 08, 2022Certificate of No Objection
Date: June 17, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: July 15, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: June 21, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 16, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 16, 2021Request for Production
Date: June 16, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: June 16, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: June 16, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: June 16, 2021Certificate of Compliance
Date: June 17, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: June 16, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 23, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: July 23, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 26, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: August 26, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: September 01, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: August 26, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: September 01, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 13, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: September 14, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: September 13, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 16, 2021Answer & Demand for Jury Trial
Date: September 17, 2021Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: September 28, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 08, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: October 12, 2021Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 14, 2021Certificate of No Objection
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 27, 2021Response to Request to Produce
Date: October 30, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 05, 2021Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 08, 2021Request to Produce
Date: November 17, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: October 30, 2021Notice of Interrogatories
Date: November 17, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 23, 2021Response to Request to Produce
Date: December 23, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 05, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 07, 2022Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: January 31, 2022Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: January 31, 2022Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: January 10, 2022Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: January 21, 2022Certificate of No Objection
Date: January 18, 2022Request for Copies
Date: January 20, 2022Request for Copies
Date: January 28, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 18, 2022Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 10, 2022Certificate of No Objection
Date: January 28, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 04, 2022Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: February 07, 2022Request for Copies
Date: February 07, 2022Certificate of No Objection
Date: February 08, 2022Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 25, 2022Notice of Mediation
Date: February 09, 2022Notice of Mediation
Date: April 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITYParty: Defendant Ebanks, Larose |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351) | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Management Conference | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.