Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wilson, Kevin, Wilson, Monica, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Hite, Dustin A, against Universal Property & Casualty Ins Co, represented by Diaz, Julissa, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Levenson, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLevenson, Jeffrey R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Request for Production
Date: June 16, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 16, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: June 16, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process
Date: June 25, 2021Certificate of Compliance
Date: June 17, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: June 16, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 08, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: July 06, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 14, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: July 20, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: July 22, 2021Request for Production
Date: July 22, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: July 22, 2021Request for Production
Date: July 30, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: July 30, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 06, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 23, 2021Interrogatories
Date: July 30, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: August 27, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 20, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 08, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: October 08, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: January 13, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: September 23, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: October 08, 2021Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: December 07, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: September 09, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: January 04, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: January 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Wilson, Kevin Plaintiff Wilson, Monica |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.