Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Espendez, Neil, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Mineo, Peter, Jr., Williams, Racheal Olivia, against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Perez, Omar Javier, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Fahnestock, Fabienne E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFahnestock, Fabienne E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Neil Espendez against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint states that the action is for damages in excess of $30,000, exclusive of interest, attorney fees, and costs. The defendant, Universal Prop...
eSummons Issuance
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 16, 2021Request for Production
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 16, 2021Certificate of Compliance
Date: June 17, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: June 16, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: June 16, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 10, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: August 15, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: September 10, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: September 12, 2021Agreed Order Granting
Date: September 15, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 25, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 25, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 15, 2021Privilege Log
Date: October 05, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: October 05, 2021Notice of Compliance
Date: October 05, 2021Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: October 27, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 05, 2021Notice to Set Case for Trial
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: November 16, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 16, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: December 01, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: December 01, 2021Request to Produce
Date: December 01, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 11, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 30, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: January 12, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 28, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: January 28, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: January 28, 2022Witness List
Date: January 31, 2022Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: March 02, 2022Response to Request for Admissions
Date: February 16, 2022Expert Witness List
Date: March 02, 2022Request to Produce
Date: March 25, 2022Motion for Entry
Date: March 04, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 15, 2022Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: March 25, 2022Privilege Log
Date: April 20, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: April 20, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 21, 2022Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: April 24, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 29, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 04, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: May 05, 2022Notice of Mediation
Date: May 06, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 10, 2022Mediation Report
Date: May 11, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 12, 2022Subpoena Returned Served
Date: May 12, 2022Subpoena Returned Served
Date: May 18, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 17, 2022Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 19, 2022Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: May 20, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 18, 2022Witness & Exhibit List
Date: May 19, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 19, 2022Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: May 23, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: May 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Affidavit | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness & Exhibit List | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Served A CROWN ROOFING, INC |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.