Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mian, Mohammad, Mian, Nabella, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Ciani, Nicholas Peter, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Rothell, Kristi Bergemann, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Notice of Filing
Date: October 13, 2022Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation
Date: October 11, 2022Amended
Date: October 13, 2022Objection
Date: October 13, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: October 17, 2022Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: November 30, 2022Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: November 30, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: May 27, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 27, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 27, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: June 01, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 24, 2021Notice of Service
Date: June 04, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: June 24, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: July 14, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 14, 2021Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: July 14, 2021Response to Request to Produce
Date: July 19, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 19, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: July 19, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 19, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 19, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: August 10, 2021Request to Produce
Date: August 10, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: September 14, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: September 29, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: September 29, 2021Subpoena for Deposition Returned Served
Date: October 09, 2021Objection
Date: October 11, 2021Case Management Order
Date: October 18, 2021Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: October 25, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 08, 2021Notice
Date: November 23, 2021Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: January 04, 2022Notice of Mediation
Date: February 07, 2022Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 14, 2022Request for Production
Date: May 27, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: May 27, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 27, 2021Privilege Log
Date: July 19, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 09, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 20, 2021Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served on the 22nd day of August, 2022 at 10:20 am, IParty: Attorney Rothell, Kristi Bergemann |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Served on the 22nd day of August, 2022 at 2:05 pmParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended EXPERT WITNESS LISTParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Objection TO PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBIT LISTParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Objection TO PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBIT LISTParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.