Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Oliveras , Gloria H, Oliveras , Jose, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Alvarez, Jamie, against United Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Merchant, Stephanie Therese, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Bidwill, Martin J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBidwill, Martin J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Notice
Date: March 01, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: November 07, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 01, 2023Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: August 23, 2022Notice
Date: September 05, 2023Notice
Date: September 07, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 27, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: May 27, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: May 27, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 27, 2021Request for Production
Date: May 27, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 27, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 27, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 27, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: May 28, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: June 29, 2021Answer to Request for Admissions
Date: October 15, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: August 26, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 07, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: September 03, 2021Case Management Order
Date: September 09, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 15, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: October 15, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: October 15, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: November 04, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: November 04, 2021Request for Production
Date: November 04, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 16, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 11, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 08, 2022Privilege Log
Date: November 11, 2021Case Management Order
Date: November 16, 2021Answer to Request for Admissions
Date: February 11, 2022Order Extending Time
Date: December 27, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: March 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SUBSTITUTION OF DEFENDANTParty: Defendant United Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SUBSTITUTION OF DEFENDANT |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice FOR MANDATORY STAY OF PROCEEDINGSParty: Defendant United Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for ProductionParty: Plaintiff Oliveras , Gloria H Plaintiff Oliveras , Jose |
|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer to Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Oliveras , Gloria H Plaintiff Oliveras , Jose |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.