Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rodriguez, Susan, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Blackwell, Beau, against St Johns Insurance Company, represented by Kaps, Hillary Jacey, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Carlos Augusto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Request
Date: May 27, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 27, 2021Request for Production
Date: May 27, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 27, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: May 27, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: June 22, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: May 28, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 27, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 22, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: June 07, 2021Request for Production
Date: June 22, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 22, 2021Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 23, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: July 19, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 19, 2021Privilege Log
Date: July 19, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 29, 2021Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 27, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: August 27, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: September 23, 2021Answer to Request for Admissions
Date: August 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Rodriguez, Susan |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Production Party: Plaintiff Rodriguez, Susan |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer to Request for Admissions Party: Plaintiff Rodriguez, Susan |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time Party: Plaintiff Rodriguez, Susan |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Privilege Log | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses Party: Defendant St Johns Insurance Company |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Admissions Party: Defendant St Johns Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.