Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ivc Coral Palm Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Arato, Joseph, Arato, Karyn, Gonnelly, Joan, Gonnelly, Joseph, Rosedale Restaurant Of Coral Springs Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Davidow, Joseph A, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2015 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by IWC Coral Palm, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, against Rosedale Restaurant of Coral Springs, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company, and individuals Joseph Arato, Karyn Arato, Joseph Gonnelly, and Joan Gonnell...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: September 04, 2015Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 13, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 9/22/2015Party: Defendant Arato, Joseph Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 9/29/2015Party: Defendant Gonnelly, Joseph Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 9/22/2015Party: Defendant Arato, Karyn Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 9/23/2015Party: Defendant Rosedale Restaurant of Coral Springs LLC Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 9/29/2015Party: Defendant Gonnelly, Joan Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time TO RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGESParty: Defendant Rosedale Restaurant of Coral Springs LLC Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Rosedale Restaurant of Coral Springs LLC Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: RICHARD L ALLEN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A132145; ;Amount: $401.00 Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: RICHARD L ALLEN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A132145; ;Amount: $10.00 Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint (eFiled) Party: Plaintiff IVC Coral Palm LLC Judge: 14 Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.