Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
State Of Florida, filed a(n) Dui case represented by Brevard Co State Attorney, against Chaves Sandra Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with KELLY INGRAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKELLY INGRAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2024 |
CategoryDui |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION Event Code 2804-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 37825053
Date: March 17, 2024NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) Event Code 6711-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 37828716
Date: March 18, 2024ORDER SETTING BOND Event Code 6425-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 37828719
Date: March 18, 2024COPY OF TRAFFIC CITATION Event Code 2744-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 37825055
Date: March 17, 2024CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION Event Code 2804-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 37825052
Date: March 17, 2024ARREST AFFIDAVIT Event Code 2700-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 37825050
Date: March 17, 2024COURT INFORMATION SHEET - (Count 2)Event Code 7810-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 37837821
Date: March 19, 2024PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER Event Code 10291-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 37828718
Date: March 18, 2024PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) BOND Event Code 5534-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 37831033
Date: March 18, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | CAL:TRAFFIC ARRAIGNMENT Event Code 3906-Event Seq 1 | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | CASH BOND - (Count 2)Event Code 5500-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 37839787 | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | CASH BOND - (Count 1)Event Code 5500-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 37839786 | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT INFORMATION SHEET - (Count 2)Event Code 7810-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 37837821 | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | E-CITATION (CITATION ELECTRONICALLY FILED BY LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY) - (Count 2)Event Code 10080-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 37837820 | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | CASH BOND ORDER/CREATE - (Count 2)Event Code 5543-Event Seq 5 | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | CASH BOND ORDER/CREATE - (Count 1)Event Code 5543-Event Seq 4 | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLETE CASE INITIATION Event Code 12163-Event Seq 1 | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) Event Code 6711-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 37828716 | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING BOND Event Code 6425-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 37828719 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.