Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
State Of Florida, filed a(n) Drugs case represented by Brevard Co State Attorney, against Dedman Bud Michael, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with TESHA SCOLARO BALLOU presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTESHA SCOLARO BALLOU Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2024 |
CategoryDrugs |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
ARREST AFFIDAVIT Event Code 2700-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 37855446
Date: March 22, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | CAL:ARRAIGNMENT Event Code 3911-Event Seq 1 | |
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED Event Code 4247-Event Seq 2 | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION Event Code 7039-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 37862893 | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Event Code 6700-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 37860943 | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLETE CASE INITIATION Event Code 12163-Event Seq 1 | |
March 24, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE Event Code 8296-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 37856438 | |
March 24, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE DOES NOT EXIST Event Code 10292-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 37856441 | |
March 24, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING BOND Event Code 6425-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 37856443 | |
March 24, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) Event Code 6711-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 37856439 | |
March 24, 2024 | Docket Event | CR: NEW COURT DATE SCHEDULED Event Code 4380-Event Seq 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.