Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
State Of Florida, filed a(n) Drugs case represented by Brevard Co State Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with AARON J PEACOCK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAARON J PEACOCK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2024 |
CategoryDrugs |
Last RefreshedMarch 22, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Event Code 6700-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 37840503
Date: March 20, 2024PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER Event Code 10291-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 37829774
Date: March 18, 2024ARREST AFFIDAVIT Event Code 2700-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 37824540
Date: March 18, 2024NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION Event Code 7039-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 37843288
Date: March 21, 2024NOTICE OF BOND CORRECTION Event Code 5532-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 37824542
Date: March 18, 2024NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) Event Code 6711-Event Seq 10-Barcode ID 37829770
Date: March 18, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | CAL:ARRAIGNMENT Event Code 3911-Event Seq 1 | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | CR: ARRAIGNMENT CANCELLED Event Code 4247-Event Seq 2 | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE CANCELLATION Event Code 7039-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 37843288 | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Event Code 6700-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 37840503 | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLETE CASE INITIATION Event Code 12163-Event Seq 1 | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER REGARDING INDIGENT STATUS ON CRIMINAL CASE Event Code 6533-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 37829772 | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER Event Code 10291-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 37829774 | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ARREST AFFIDAVIT Event Code 2700-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 37824540 | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER (PD) AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPOINTMENT Event Code 6534-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 37829771 | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES REGARDING INITIAL APPEARANCE Event Code 8296-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 37829769 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.