Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Perkins Jeremy, filed a(n) General Antitrust - Antitrust case represented by Stewart Blake, against Black Chad, Black Charles David, Black Kristin Danae, Brimmer Kristin Danae, Pecot Keith, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with CURT JACOBUS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2023 |
CategoryAnti-Trust Trade Regulations |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaAntitrust |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Antitrust |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION Event Code 9740-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 37077169
Date: September 20, 2023NOTICE OF ACTION Event Code 7696-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 36875643
Date: August 08, 2023NOTICE OF DROPPING COUNT Event Code 10251-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 36872942
Date: July 31, 2023RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 36796427
Date: July 13, 2023RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 36796428
Date: July 13, 2023SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Event Code 6821-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 36212625
Date: March 14, 2023RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 36192747
Date: March 09, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY Event Code 10476-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 36071823
Date: February 09, 2023MOTION FOR ENTRY OF LIEN Event Code 2760-Event Seq 7-Barcode ID 36069571
Date: February 08, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY Event Code 10476-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 36071821
Date: February 09, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY Event Code 10476-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 36071822
Date: February 09, 2023PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Event Code 5583-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 36069570
Date: February 08, 2023PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Event Code 5583-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 36069569
Date: February 08, 2023PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Event Code 5583-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 36069568
Date: February 08, 2023COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Event Code 2858-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 36069538
Date: February 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2023 | MOTION FOR EXTENSION Event Code 9740-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 37077169 | ||
September 20, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS Event Code 6670-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 37077168 | ||
August 08, 2023 | NOTICE OF ACTION Event Code 7696-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 36875643 | ||
August 08, 2023 | NTC OF ACTION MAILED TO DEFS Event Code 5484-Event Seq 2 | ||
July 31, 2023 | NOTICE OF DROPPING COUNT Event Code 10251-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 36872942 | ||
July 13, 2023 | RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 36796427 | ||
July 13, 2023 | RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 36796428 | ||
July 13, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH WITH NON-MILITARY Event Code 5238-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 36798882 | ||
June 01, 2023 | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Event Code 6817-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 36574521 | ||
March 27, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS Event Code 6670-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 36294116 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.