Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
City Of Melbourne, filed a(n) Municipal Ordinance case represented by Brevard Co State Attorney, against Veil Carl Fredrick, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with RHONDA E. BABB presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2022 |
CategoryMunicipal Ordinance |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
INFORMATION Event Code 2706-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 35971533
Date: January 17, 2023ARREST AFFIDAVIT NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) Event Code 2730-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 35899468
Date: December 28, 2022COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT Event Code 8214-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 36001970
Date: January 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 | COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT Event Code 8214-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 36001970 | ||
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | CAL:ARRAIGNMENT Event Code 3911-Event Seq 1 | |
January 25, 2023 | CR: DISPOSED BY PROSECUTOR Event Code 4447-Event Seq 2 | ||
January 25, 2023 | CRIM/TRAF/JUV ORIG DISPOSITION Event Code 2600-Event Seq 4 | ||
January 17, 2023 | INFORMATION Event Code 2706-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 35971533 | ||
January 11, 2023 | RSGN: PROGRAM/CLERK PROBLEM Event Code 4706-Event Seq 1 | ||
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ASM: MUNI ORDINANCE FILING FEE Event Code 8887-Event Seq 1 | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ARREST AFFIDAVIT NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) Event Code 2730-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 35899468 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.