Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
City Of Cocoa Beach, filed a(n) Municipal Ordinance case represented by Brevard Co State Attorney, against Vasquezangle Michael Andrew, represented by Regional Conflict Counsel 5Th, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with RHONDA E. BABB presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2022 |
CategoryMunicipal Ordinance |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Event Code 6700-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 35289720
Date: July 28, 2022NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) Event Code 6711-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 35302775
Date: August 01, 2022COURT MINUTES REGARDING ARRAIGNMENT Event Code 8214-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 35302774
Date: August 01, 2022INFORMATION Event Code 2706-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 35227143
Date: July 14, 2022ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES Event Code 6677-Event Seq 18-Barcode ID 35484476
Date: September 13, 2022JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION Event Code 5636-Event Seq 19-Barcode ID 35484477
Date: September 13, 2022COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING Event Code 8218-Event Seq 17-Barcode ID 35484475
Date: September 13, 2022NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) Event Code 6711-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 35181107
Date: July 02, 2022PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER Event Code 10291-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 35181111
Date: July 02, 2022ARREST AFFIDAVIT Event Code 2700-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 35180598
Date: July 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2023 | PLACED WITH LINEBARGER Event Code 10342-Event Seq 1 | ||
September 13, 2022 | ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES Event Code 6677-Event Seq 18-Barcode ID 35484476 | ||
September 13, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION Event Code 5636-Event Seq 19-Barcode ID 35484477 | ||
September 13, 2022 | COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING Event Code 8218-Event Seq 17-Barcode ID 35484475 | ||
September 13, 2022 | ASM: CERTIFY & RECORD ORDER CO - (Count 1)Event Code 10636-Event Seq 22 | ||
September 13, 2022 | ASM: ADDL COURT FUND COUNTY - (Count 1)Event Code 4043-Event Seq 10 | ||
September 13, 2022 | ASM: POL ACAD/LEEF COUNTY - (Count 1)Event Code 950-Event Seq 9 | ||
September 13, 2022 | ASM: CTY CRIM COPY PER PAGE - (Count 1)Event Code 2637-Event Seq 24 | ||
September 13, 2022 | PLEA: NOLO CONTENDERE - (Count 1)Event Code 7528-Event Seq 2 | ||
September 13, 2022 | CR: HEARD Event Code 4412-Event Seq 16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.