Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Of Florida, filed a(n) Dui case represented by Brevard Co State Attorney, against Trodella Angelo Gerard, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with RHONDA E. BABB presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2022 |
CategoryDui |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
PAYMENT SCHEDULE Event Code 8182-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 36632508
Date: June 14, 2023JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE Event Code 5600-Event Seq 31-Barcode ID 35682344
Date: November 01, 2022ORDER OF IMMOBILIZATION Event Code 6371-Event Seq 33-Barcode ID 35682345
Date: November 01, 2022COURT MINUTES REGARDING PLEA Event Code 8221-Event Seq 30-Barcode ID 35682342
Date: November 01, 2022ORDER FOR FINE, COST, AND FEES Event Code 6677-Event Seq 32-Barcode ID 35682343
Date: November 01, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 35647542
Date: October 24, 2022WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL Event Code 6833-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 35502900
Date: September 16, 2022COURT MINUTES REGARDING DOCKET SOUNDING Event Code 8218-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 35502898
Date: September 16, 2022WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY Event Code 7205-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 35441735
Date: September 01, 2022NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) Event Code 6711-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 35441734
Date: September 01, 2022SURETY BOND - (Count 1)Event Code 5501-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 35362966
Date: August 09, 2022COURT INFORMATION SHEET - (Count 2)Event Code 7810-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 35358751
Date: August 12, 2022ORDER SETTING BOND Event Code 6425-Event Seq 13-Barcode ID 35329181
Date: August 07, 2022NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) Event Code 6711-Event Seq 12-Barcode ID 35329177
Date: August 07, 2022CIVIL TRAFFIC CITATION Event Code 2704-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 35328839
Date: August 07, 2022PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER Event Code 10291-Event Seq 8-Barcode ID 35329180
Date: August 07, 2022ARREST AFFIDAVIT Event Code 2700-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 35328837
Date: August 07, 2022NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) Event Code 6711-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 35502899
Date: September 16, 2022COURT MINUTES REGARDING TRAFFIC ARRAIGNMENT Event Code 8211-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 35441733
Date: September 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT TO ATTEND SCHOOL - (Count 2)Event Code 8829-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 35338003
Date: August 09, 2022COPY OF CRIMINAL TRAFFIC CITATION Event Code 5083-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 35328838
Date: August 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2023 | DHSMV DISPOSITION TRANSMITTED - (Count 1)Event Code 7953-Event Seq 1 | ||
August 01, 2023 | NOTICE OF COMPLETION Event Code 6812-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 36841650 | ||
August 01, 2023 | VEHICLE IMPOUNDMENT ORDERED - (Count 1)Event Code 8136-Event Seq 3 | ||
August 01, 2023 | VICTIM AWARENESS PGM ORDERED - (Count 1)Event Code 2170-Event Seq 2 | ||
August 01, 2023 | DUI SCHOOL LEVEL I ORDERED - (Count 1)Event Code 2155-Event Seq 1 | ||
August 01, 2023 | COMMUNITY SERVICE ORDERED - (Count 1)Event Code 2196-Event Seq 4 | ||
June 14, 2023 | PAYMENT SCHEDULE Event Code 8182-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 36632508 | ||
June 14, 2023 | REQUEST REGARDING DEFERRED PAYMENT PROGRAM Event Code 3445-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 36632501 | ||
June 14, 2023 | CONTRACT CREATED Event Code 8177-Event Seq 5 | ||
June 14, 2023 | AUTHORIZED BY ADMIN ORD 04-49B Event Code 8194-Event Seq 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.