Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with MICHELLE NABERHAUS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Real Prop 50001-249999 |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33220092
Date: March 20, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33387032
Date: April 22, 2021PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Event Code 5583-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33220093
Date: March 20, 2021RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33387030
Date: April 22, 2021DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33389136
Date: May 04, 2021NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE Event Code 6735-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33485387
Date: May 26, 2021SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Event Code 6821-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33535263
Date: June 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS Event Code 5125-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33445293
Date: May 17, 2021RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33352484
Date: April 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT Event Code 5134-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33445292
Date: May 10, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 33500331
Date: May 24, 2021MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Event Code 2931-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33445291
Date: May 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CR: JUDICIAL SALE CANCELLED Event Code 4645-Event Seq 2 | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CAL:FORECLOSURE SALE Event Code 3948-Event Seq 1 | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Event Code 6821-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33535263 | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE OF SALE Event Code 7715-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33553455 | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE Event Code 6735-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33485387 | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 4 | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 3 | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | PMT:FCL >50000 < 250000 Event Code 1311-Event Seq 2 | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | PMT:FORECLOSURE 50000 OR LESS Event Code 1309-Event Seq 1 | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | PMT:FCL >50,000 < 250,000 Event Code 1311-Event Seq 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.