Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shapow Judy W, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with MORGAN LAUR REINMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMORGAN LAUR REINMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2022 | ORDER FOR DISPOSITION FOR PERSONAL PROPERTY WITHOUT ADMINISTRATION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6351-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 34829996 | ||
April 07, 2022 | ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 1 | ||
January 14, 2022 | ORDER FOR DISPOSITION FOR PERSONAL PROPERTY WITHOUT ADMINISTRATION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6351-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 34467034 | ||
January 14, 2022 | ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 1 | ||
January 11, 2022 | PETITION FOR DISPOSITION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY WITHOUT ADMINISTRATION Event Code 2832-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34461840 | ||
January 11, 2022 | REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 2 | ||
January 07, 2022 | PETITION FOR DISPOSITION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY WITHOUT ADMINISTRATION Event Code 2832-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34442526 | ||
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION Event Code 4132-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 34310762 | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 3 | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISPOSITION OF PERSONAL PROPERTY WITHOUT ADMINISTRATION Event Code 2832-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34310755 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.