Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hartsfield P Timothy, Shellene Jody C, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with MORGAN LAUR REINMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMORGAN LAUR REINMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1 | ||
December 14, 2021 | ORDER ADMITTING WILL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6306-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 34353907 | ||
December 14, 2021 | ORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6275-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 34353908 | ||
November 24, 2021 | PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE Event Code 5153-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34284069 | ||
October 11, 2021 | FORMAL NOTICE Event Code 6775-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34088236 | ||
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 3 | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION Event Code 10282-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33916211 | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ASM: SUMMARY ADMIN $1000+ Event Code 2372-Event Seq 2 | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ASM: NOTICE OF TRUST Event Code 18-Event Seq 7 | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ASM: CIR RECORDING 1ST PG Event Code 10101-Event Seq 10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.