Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wasdin Family Ltd, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Lefebvre Jason, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with RHONDA E. BABB presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRHONDA E. BABB Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Eviction |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7693-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34114980
Date: October 18, 2021COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33933785
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2021 | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7693-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34114980 | ||
September 30, 2021 | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED Event Code 7691-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 34036999 | ||
September 30, 2021 | FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5642-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 34035671 | ||
September 30, 2021 | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1 | ||
September 22, 2021 | DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33999611 | ||
September 21, 2021 | F/J FWD TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW Event Code 10635-Event Seq 1 | ||
September 17, 2021 | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK Event Code 2920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33991774 | ||
September 15, 2021 | RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33981595 | ||
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33933785 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 8 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.