Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Village Garden Apartments Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Mayhue Robert, Unknown Tenants, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with KELLY INGRAM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKELLY INGRAM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Eviction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2021 | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE Event Code 10256-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 34107965 | ||
October 13, 2021 | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1 | ||
October 05, 2021 | CR: HEARING CANCELLED Event Code 4291-Event Seq 2 | ||
October 05, 2021 | CAL:EVICTION HEARING Event Code 3954-Event Seq 1 | ||
September 09, 2021 | NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33947966 | ||
September 07, 2021 | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Event Code 2931-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33935161 | ||
September 03, 2021 | RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33928076 | ||
September 03, 2021 | RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33928075 | ||
August 27, 2021 | REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33914762 | ||
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 9 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.