Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CHARLES WOOSLEY VS FEDNAT INS
On June 30, 2020 a contract & indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge MICHELLE NABERHAUS presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 30, 2020
Last Refreshed
December 20, 2023
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I BREACH OF CONTRACT
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT Event Code 1644-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34180024
Date: Nov 02, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION Event Code 9740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32705360
Date: Nov 13, 2020AMENDED COMPLAINT Event Code 2812-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32571855
Date: Oct 14, 2020REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4930-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 32392470
Date: Sep 03, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32392469
Date: Sep 03, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2021 | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE Event Code 10256-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 34373633 | ||
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1 | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT Event Code 1644-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 34180024 | |
July 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER/NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REQUIREMENT Event Code 12075-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33754020 | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32821366 | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION Event Code 9740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32705360 | |
October 20, 2020 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS Event Code 6670-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32598002 | ||
October 20, 2020 | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Event Code 6817-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 32598003 | ||
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT Event Code 2812-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32571855 | |
September 03, 2020 | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4930-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 32392470 | ||
September 03, 2020 | REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32392469 | ||
September 03, 2020 | INTERROGATORIES Event Code 4616-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 32392471 | ||
July 16, 2020 | SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY Event Code 10476-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32199814 | ||
July 13, 2020 | PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Event Code 5583-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 32199535 | ||
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 1 | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1 | |
June 30, 2020 | COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Event Code 2858-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32148412 | ||
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE Event Code 2138-Event Seq 2 | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 3 |