Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TERESA ROBINSON VS WALMART
On June 30, 2020 a premises liability commercial case was filed in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL. Judge MICHELLE NABERHAUS presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 30, 2020
Last Refreshed
December 20, 2023
Filing Location
Brevard County, FL
Category
PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Status
Closed
Parties
Case Documents
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6866-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33762011
Date: Jul 28, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 33210883
Date: Mar 16, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4930-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33210881
Date: Mar 16, 2021NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 32917566
Date: Jan 04, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS Event Code 2913-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32404853
Date: Sep 04, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 9922-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33846040 | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1 | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2 | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1 | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6866-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 33762011 | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 33210883 | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4930-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 33210881 | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Event Code 6739-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 33210884 | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 32917566 | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1 | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS Event Code 2913-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32404853 | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1 | |
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY Event Code 10476-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 32149135 | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 7 | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 8 | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE Event Code 2138-Event Seq 6 |