Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Gingo Lisa, filed a(n) General Antitrust - Antitrust case represented by Bookhardt Samuel Iii, against Advanced Data Processing Inc, Intermedix, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with STEPHEN R KOONS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2017 |
CategoryAnti-Trust Trade Regulations |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaAntitrust |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Antitrust |
COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Event Code 2858-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27838688
Date: September 17, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL Event Code 5348-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 28271389
Judge: STEPHEN R KOONS |
|
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1
Judge: STEPHEN R KOONS |
|
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: STEPHEN R KOONS |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27911682
Judge: STEPHEN R KOONS |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27911682 | |
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY Event Code 10476-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27841488
Judge: STEPHEN R KOONS |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY Event Code 10476-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27841488
Judge: STEPHEN R KOONS |
|
September 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
ASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS Event Code 9566-Event Seq 4
Judge: STEPHEN R KOONS |
|
September 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Event Code 5583-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27838685
Judge: STEPHEN R KOONS |
|
September 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
ASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE Event Code 2138-Event Seq 3
Judge: STEPHEN R KOONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.