Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 13, 2017 |
CategoryFcl-Homestead $50001-$249999 |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE Event Code 5351-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 30779923
Date: July 24, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 28236041
Date: December 18, 2017MOTION FOR EXTENSION Event Code 9740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 28086758
Date: November 14, 2017ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL Event Code 6475-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30530368
Date: May 24, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4927-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 29692970
Date: November 09, 2018RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 4920-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 28556491
Date: March 02, 2018MOTION TO STRIKE Event Code 2959-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30512283
Date: May 22, 2019ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE Event Code 6368-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 30959996
Date: September 06, 2019REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Event Code 6787-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 29688896
Date: November 08, 2018REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Event Code 6787-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 28491260
Date: February 15, 2018MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER Event Code 2990-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 29573933
Date: October 15, 2018MOTION FOR EXTENSION Event Code 9740-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 28063644
Date: November 07, 2017REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Event Code 6787-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 28820223
Date: May 01, 2018MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Event Code 2914-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30955407
Date: August 30, 2019MOTION FOR EXTENSION Event Code 9740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 28063643
Date: November 07, 2017RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4927-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 28761260
Date: April 16, 2018RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4927-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 28171019
Date: December 01, 2017MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code 2922-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 29529280
Date: October 04, 2018REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4962-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 29105336
Date: July 02, 2018MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code 2922-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 28491265
Date: February 15, 2018REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Event Code 6787-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 29529281
Date: October 04, 2018ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE Event Code 6368-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30779563
Date: July 24, 2019REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 29419488
Date: September 11, 2018REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4930-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 28236039
Date: December 18, 2017RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Event Code 4927-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 28228227
Date: December 19, 2017REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30341251
Date: April 15, 2019MOTION FOR EXTENSION Event Code 9740-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27592660
Date: July 19, 2017ORDER EXTENDING TIME Event Code 6261-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 28114091
Date: November 17, 2017REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30377000
Date: April 22, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 27946879
Date: October 12, 2017MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Event Code 2914-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30955407
Date: August 30, 2019ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE Event Code 6368-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30779563
Date: July 24, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30980083
Date: September 10, 2019NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT Event Code 6938-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30443148
Date: May 07, 2019REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30341251
Date: April 15, 2019NOTICE OF INTENT Event Code 7030-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 28814623
Date: May 01, 2018NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL MORTGAGE Event Code 10371-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 29424777
Date: August 21, 2018NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27643339
Date: July 28, 2017REQUEST TO PRODUCE Event Code 6729-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 28236041
Date: December 18, 2017ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27579339
Date: July 17, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30177540
Date: March 06, 2019COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 27444491
Date: June 13, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORIG NOTE/MTG RETD PER ORDER Event Code 4991-Event Seq 1
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6209-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 31648845
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 10257-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 31638965
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
ASM: RECORDING THREE PAGES Event Code 10261-Event Seq 2
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Event Code 6722-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 31638964
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 10257-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 31638965
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
ASM: INDEX RECORDING NAMES > 4 Event Code 1662-Event Seq 3
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE Event Code 6859-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30980083
Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.