Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Heatquest Llc, filed a(n) Other Circuit Civil case represented by Williams John Mason 4, against Davis Arthur J Jr, Johnson Alfonso, Uknown Tenant 1, Unknown Individuals Any All, Unknown Tenant 2, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with GEORGE W. MAXWELL III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2016 |
CategoryOther Circuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by HEATQUEST, LLC against ARTHUR J. DAVIS, JR. a/k/a ALFONSO JOHNSON, UNKNOWN TENANT #1, UNKNOWN TENANT #2, and any other unknown individuals residing in the premises. The complaint alleges unlawful detainer, possession, and e...
COMPLAINT OR PETITION Event Code 2835-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26209404
Date: August 19, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED Event Code 7693-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26466541
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
October 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED Event Code 7691-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26412539
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5628-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 26401186
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Event Code 3004-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26317843
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT Event Code 2923-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 26314787
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 26310053
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED Event Code 6143-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 26301490
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 26310044
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
|
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE Event Code 11045-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 26310052
Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.