Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rodriguez Steve, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Marin Ana Carmen, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERT T BURGER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
VITAL STATISTIC FORM GENERATED Event Code 9789-Event Seq 1
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5635-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24601314
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 2
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND WAIVER Event Code 4922-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24513719
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Event Code 5322-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24513720
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Event Code 5320-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24513722
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 7
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
PETITION Event Code 8031-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 24449775
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
DETERMINATION INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT) Event Code 7101-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 24449857
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.