Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hobbs Kathryn Louise, Dixon Kathryn H, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dixon Robert H, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERT T BURGER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION Event Code 6234-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 24589750
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO THE GENERAL MASTER Event Code 6227-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24589682
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 3
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Event Code 7424-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24544037
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24446239
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR MODIFICATION Event Code 5350-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24398589
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
|
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR MODIFICATION Event Code 5350-Event Seq 2
Judge: ROBERT T BURGER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.