Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with GEORGE T PAULK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2013 |
CategoryOther Family Court |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
TERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES Event Code 5742-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 25654911
Judge: GEORGE T PAULK |
|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
ALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED Event Code 3579-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE T PAULK |
|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING PETITION OR MOTION Event Code 6282-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 25080442
Judge: GEORGE T PAULK |
|
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: GEORGE T PAULK |
|
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 2
Judge: GEORGE T PAULK |
|
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RETURNED UNSERVED Event Code 6848-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24880966
Judge: GEORGE T PAULK |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL Event Code 5972-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24712180
Judge: GEORGE T PAULK |
|
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 3008-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24610403
Judge: GEORGE T PAULK |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RETURNED UNSERVED Event Code 6848-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24198231
Judge: GEORGE T PAULK |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Event Code 6411-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 24130259
Judge: GEORGE T PAULK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.