Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with CHARLES J ROBERTS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE Event Code 10256-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 29501168
Date: September 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
CR: CASE MGMNT CONF CANCELLED Event Code 5738-Event Seq 2
Judge: CHARLES J ROBERTS |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
CAL:CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE Event Code 6075-Event Seq 1
Judge: CHARLES J ROBERTS |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE Event Code 10256-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 29501168
Judge: CHARLES J ROBERTS |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Event Code 9883-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 29483291
Judge: CHARLES J ROBERTS |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 2
Judge: CHARLES J ROBERTS |
|
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: CHARLES J ROBERTS |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: CHARLES J ROBERTS |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING CANCELLED Event Code 4291-Event Seq 2
Judge: CHARLES J ROBERTS |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: CHARLES J ROBERTS |
|
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING Event Code 6741-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23011197
Judge: CHARLES J ROBERTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.