Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with DAVID DUGAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2013 |
CategoryFcl-Homestead $50001-$249999 |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MOTION TO VACATE Event Code 2964-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22936071
Date: June 09, 2014MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL Event Code 2958-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 27055507
Date: March 06, 2017ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4949-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22186194
Date: December 16, 2013ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Event Code 6347-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27027962
Date: March 09, 2017REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Event Code 4962-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22257241
Date: January 08, 2014MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY(IES) Event Code 2755-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 31824720
Date: March 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY(IES) Event Code 2755-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 31824720
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
REOPEN FILING UPDATED Event Code 2802-Event Seq 1
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6734-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 31779196
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
ASM: RECORDING TWO PAGES Event Code 10259-Event Seq 1
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Event Code 9948-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 31769215
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Event Code 5176-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 31734566
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Event Code 6720-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 31734565
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Event Code 6347-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 27027962
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
REOPEN DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2803-Event Seq 2
Judge: DAVID DUGAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.