Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5634-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20496638
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 5
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
CAL:HEARING Event Code 3922-Event Seq 1
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 4
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
CR: HEARING HEARD Event Code 4407-Event Seq 3
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
February 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code 6724-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20435428
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE OF PARENT EDUCATION COURSE (COPE) Event Code 8931-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20426969
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Event Code 5320-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20427028
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
January 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE Event Code 4921-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20360236
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT Event Code 932-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20333020
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.