Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Thompson Andrea Joy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Thompson Cecil F, in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
VITAL STATISTIC FORM GENERATED Event Code 9789-Event Seq 1
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5634-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20598266
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
GENERAL MASTER OR MAGISTRATE REPORT Event Code 7838-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20598254
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 3
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION Event Code 4129-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20412811
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO THE GENERAL MASTER Event Code 6227-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20390023
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL FILING UPDATED Event Code 2800-Event Seq 1
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT Event Code 932-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 20260286
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
PARENTING PLAN Event Code 4149-Event Seq 6-Barcode ID 20260287
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE Event Code 11567-Event Seq 9-Barcode ID 20260290
Judge: JOHN D. MOXLEY, JR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.