Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with C ROBERTS-GM K SMITH RODRIGUEZ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeC ROBERTS-GM K SMITH RODRIGUEZ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryPaternity/Disestablishment Pat |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER LACK OF PROSECUTION CASE TO REMAIN PENDING Event Code 5268-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30934252
Judge: C ROBERTS-GM K SMITH RODRIGUEZ |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1
Judge: C ROBERTS-GM K SMITH RODRIGUEZ |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5644-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 30857432
Judge: C ROBERTS-GM K SMITH RODRIGUEZ |
|
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
CR: LOP HEARING HEARD Event Code 5274-Event Seq 3
Judge: C ROBERTS-GM K SMITH RODRIGUEZ |
|
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Event Code 7424-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 30830115
Judge: C ROBERTS-GM K SMITH RODRIGUEZ |
|
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Event Code 7424-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 30830534
Judge: C ROBERTS-GM K SMITH RODRIGUEZ |
|
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
CAL:LOP HEARING Event Code 2472-Event Seq 1
Judge: C ROBERTS-GM K SMITH RODRIGUEZ |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: C ROBERTS-GM K SMITH RODRIGUEZ |
|
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (LOP) Event Code 5262-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 30551793
Judge: C ROBERTS-GM K SMITH RODRIGUEZ |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: C ROBERTS-GM K SMITH RODRIGUEZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.