Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rinehart Charles filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD BALANCE RSGMNT Event Code 10975-Event Seq 1
Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO |
|
January 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
TO BE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE BAKER AS OF 01-01-2019 Event Code 11699-Event Seq 1
Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO |
|
September 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO |
|
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
LACK OF PROSECUTION ELIGIBLE Event Code 5560-Event Seq 1
Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT Event Code 4709-Event Seq 1
Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO |
|
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE Event Code 6348-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 20311990
Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO |
|
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6244-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 20311998
Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 5137-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 20261755
Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.