Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Campbell Beatrice filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with JOHN M HARRIS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHN M HARRIS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 1
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISCHARGING THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6171-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23955093
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Event Code 6838-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23677430
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
REPORT OF DISTRIBUTION Event Code 7435-Event Seq 5-Barcode ID 23677437
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION OR PETITION TO DISCHARGE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE Event Code 10277-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 23677431
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
WAIVER Event Code 6842-Event Seq 4-Barcode ID 23677435
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
WAIVER Event Code 6842-Event Seq 3-Barcode ID 23677434
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM Event Code 7321-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23110085
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM Event Code 7321-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21616997
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6224-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21452678
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.