Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Anderson Rodney E filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Brevard County, FL, . Brevard County, FL Superior Courts with JOHN M HARRIS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHN M HARRIS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBrevard County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED Event Code 2801-Event Seq 2
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISCHARGING THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6171-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23954873
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION OR PETITION TO DISCHARGE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE Event Code 10277-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23929235
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
WAIVER Event Code 6842-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23906925
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
July 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION OR PETITION TO DISCHARGE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE Event Code 10277-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 23092781
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
WAIVER Event Code 6842-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22900595
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
WAIVER Event Code 6842-Event Seq 2-Barcode ID 22900596
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 6224-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 22077388
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
October 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Event Code 5158-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21850860
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS Event Code 2750-Event Seq 1-Barcode ID 21844112
Judge: JOHN M HARRIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.